McDonald v. Federal Communications Commission et al
Petitioner: Jessie D. McDonald
Respondent: Tennessee Elections Commission and Federal Communications Commission
Case Number: 3:2019cv00072
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Accordingly, the in forma pauperis application (Doc. No. 2) and the Motion for Leave (Doc. No. 3) are both DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED under Rule 41(b) for failure to comply with previous court orders. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/23/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
January 17, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Accompanying #1 Petition by Jessie D. McDonald. (afs) Modified on 1/17/2019 (afs).
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jessie D. McDonald. (afs)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition against Federal Communications Commission, Tennessee Elections Commission, filed by Jessie D. McDonald. (afs) Modified on 1/17/2019 (afs). Modified on 1/17/2019 (afs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Federal Communications Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessie D. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tennessee Elections Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?