Stoller v. Discover Products, Inc.

Plaintiff: Lee Stoller
Defendant: Discover Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00088
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Discover Products, Inc..(Miller, Zachary)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Discover Products, Inc. answer due 3/1/2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/13/19. (gb)
February 13, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Zachary D. Miller and Parris M. Bell. (gb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Discover Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment To Business Entity Disclosure)(Miller, Zachary)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Discover Products, Inc.. (Miller, Zachary)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Lee Stoller. Discover Products, Inc. served on 1/25/2019. (Kerney, Frank)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 2:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Discover Products, Inc. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
January 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher K. Thompson and Frank H. Kerney, III. (jw)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Discover Products, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2834642), filed by Lee Stoller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoller v. Discover Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Products, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary D. Miller
Represented By: Parris M. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Stoller
Represented By: Christopher K. Thompson
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?