Showhomes Franchise Corporation v. CEG Staging Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Showhomes Franchise Corporation
Defendant: Chalmers Greenlee IV and CEG Staging Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00100
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference is RESET for April 11, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint proposed Initial Case Management order by April 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/19/2019. (jm)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Showhomes Franchise Corporation. (Elbert, Philip)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Showhomes Franchise Corporation. CEG Staging Services, LLC served on 2/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Proof of mailing to FL Division of Corporations, #2 Attachment 2 - Verification of service from FL Division of Corporations)(Elbert, Philip)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Showhomes Franchise Corporation. Chalmers Greenlee IV served on 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Affidavit of Service)(Elbert, Philip)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to CEG Staging Services, LLC and Chalmers Greenlee IV. (jm)
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Showhomes Franchise Corporation as to Chalmers Greenlee IV. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - USPS Certified Mail Tracking History)(Elbert, Philip)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Showhomes Franchise Corporation as to CEG Staging Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - USPS Certified Mail Tracking History)(Elbert, Philip)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/13/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to CEG Staging Services, LLC and Chalmers Greenlee IV. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.)(jm)
January 25, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Philip N. Elbert and Arrin K. Richards. (jm)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Showhomes Franchise Corporation. (jm)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CEG Staging Services, LLC and Chalmers Greenlee IV (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2839266), filed by Showhomes Franchise Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Seminole/Orange County Franchise Agreement (Unit 1), #3 Exhibit 2 - Orange County Franchise Agreement (Unit 2), #4 Exhibit 3 - Showhomes Letter 1, #5 Exhibit 4 - CEG Letter 1, #6 Exhibit 5 - Showhomes Letter 2, #7 Exhibit 6 - CEG Letter 2, #8 Exhibit 7 - Showhomes Letter 3, #9 Exhibit 8 - Staging Prestige LLC Articles of Organization, #10 Exhibit 9 - Testimonials from Staging Prestige website) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Showhomes Franchise Corporation v. CEG Staging Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chalmers Greenlee IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEG Staging Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Showhomes Franchise Corporation
Represented By: Arrin K. Richards
Represented By: Philip N. Elbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?