County Mutual Insurance Company v. Wadhwani

Plaintiff: County Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Anita Wadhwani
Case Number: 3:2019cv00114
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/27/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Anita Wadhwani. (Attachments: #1 Attachment [Proposed) Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference)(Risin, Clarence)
February 27, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Clarence Risin. (dt)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Anita Wadhwani.(Risin, Clarence)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Cooper, David)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by County Mutual Insurance Company. Anita Wadhwani served on 2/5/2019. (Cooper, David)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/4/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
February 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for David L. Cooper. (dt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Anita Wadhwani. (Service copies picked up by counsel.) (dt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anita Wadhwani (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675053582), filed by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Receipt)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County Mutual Insurance Company v. Wadhwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Wadhwani
Represented By: Clarence Risin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?