Capitani v. World of Miniature Bears, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dina Capitani
Defendant: World of Miniature Bears, Inc. and Minibearsgems & Gifts, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00120
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: On March 28, 2019, this action was reassigned to the undersigned as the case manager. The Joint Motion to Postpone Initial Case Management Conference (Docket No. #12 ) is GRANTED, and the Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled for May 13, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 783, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/29/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
March 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley added per recusal order entered at DE 13. Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern no longer assigned to case. (af)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: I hereby recuse myself from all further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to assign a different magistrate judge to this action by random selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on March 27, 2019. (AN)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Postpone Initial Case Management Conference by Minibearsgems & Gifts, Inc., World of Miniature Bears, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Goff, Desiree)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Dina Capitani re #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Dina Capitani. (Deel, Michael)
March 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael S. Deel. (jm)
March 20, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (jm)
March 20, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (jm)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Deel on behalf of Dina Capitani (Deel, Michael)
March 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Desiree Julein Clark Goff and John A. Beam, III. (jm)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Minibearsgems & Gifts, Inc..(Goff, Desiree)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by World of Miniature Bears, Inc..(Goff, Desiree)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Minibearsgems & Gifts, Inc. and World of Miniature Bears, Inc. (Service copies to be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dina Capitani. (jm)
February 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Autumn Gentry. (jm)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Minibearsgems & Gifts, Inc. and World of Miniature Bears, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675053644), filed by Dina Capitani. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Filing Fee Receipt, #3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael Deel, #4 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 - Order Confirmation, #5 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1 - Package Label, #6 Exhibit C to Exhibit 1 - USPS tracking, #7 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Registration, #8 Exhibit 3 - Licensing Agreement, #9 Exhibit 4 - Amendment to Licensing Agreement, #10 Exhibit 5 - Capitani - Roebuck email dated September 27, 2011, #11 Exhibit 6 - Amazon Printout, #12 Exhibit 7 - Oct. 27, 2017 Order, #13 Exhibit 8 - Printout from Website www.minibeargems.com, #14 Exhibit 9 - Amazon Printout, #15 Exhibit 10 - PicClick printout, #16 Exhibit 11 - Beagle Illustration) (jm) Modified on 2/7/2019 (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capitani v. World of Miniature Bears, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World of Miniature Bears, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Beam, III
Represented By: Desiree Julein Clark Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minibearsgems & Gifts, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Beam, III
Represented By: Desiree Julein Clark Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Capitani
Represented By: Autumn Gentry
Represented By: Michael S. Deel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?