Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina v. Law Office of Michael A. Demayo, LLP

Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina
Defendant: Law Office of Michael A. Demayo, LLP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00155
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Docket Entry No. #8 ). As evidenced below by the signatures of counsel, the parties agree that the Motion should be resolved as follows: Defendant will maintain at least $7,497.99 in its operating account until further orders of the Court or the resolution of Plaintiff's claim. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/27/19. (dt)
March 27, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William T. Ramsey. (dt)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #8 ). The parties have filed a Proposed Order (Doc. No. #13 ) resolving the Motion by agreement, and the Court will issue that Order as requested. Accordingly, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion, scheduled for March 27, 2019, is canceled, and Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #8 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/27/19. (dt)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER re: #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Ramsey, William) Modified on 3/27/2019 (dt).
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William T. Ramsey on behalf of Law Office of Michael A. Demayo, LLP (Ramsey, William)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER by Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Campbell, Karla) Modified on 3/26/2019 (dt).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #8 ). The Court will hear arguments on Plaintiff's Motion on Wednesday, March 27, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. The arguments (and any submission of evidence) must be concluded by 3:00 p.m. Defendant shall file a Response to Plaintiff's Motion by the close of business on Monday, March 25, 2019. In addition, Plaintiff shall file, by the close of business on Monday, March 25, 2019, a Proposed Order as required by Local Rule 65.01(b). Counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/22/19. (dt)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina . (Campbell, Karla)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Karla M. Campbell, #2 Attachment Declaration of Teresa Jernigan)(Campbell, Karla)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina. Law Office of Michael A. Demayo, LLP served on 3/4/2019. (Campbell, Karla)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/20/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Law Office of Michael A. Demayo, LLP. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (dt)
February 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Jan Jennings and Karla M. Campbell. (dt)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Law Office of Michael A. Demayo, LLP (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2854918), filed by Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - section 10 of plan document, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina v. Law Office of Michael A. Demayo, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Michael A. Demayo, LLP
Represented By: William T. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' Health and Welfare Fund of North Carolina
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?