Davydov v. Jacobs et al
Plaintiff: Robert Davydov
Defendant: David Duckworth, Vicky B. Gregg, William F. Grieco, William Brent Turner, Reeve B. Waud, Joey A. Jacobs, E. Perot Bissell, Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., Hartley R. Rogers, William M. Petrie, Wade D. Miquelon, Christopher R. Gordon and Ronald M. Fincher
Case Number: 3:2019cv00167
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: To facilitate case management consistent with Judge Richardson's referral of this case (see Order at Docket No. #6 ), the direction for the parties to meet and confer regarding further scheduling is expanded as follows. Within fourteen (14) days of the ruling on defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the Federal Securities Class Action, the parties must file a joint motion to reset the initial case management conference on a mutually agreeable date and time to be obtained by the parties from Ms. Jeanne Cox, Courtroom Deputy. By no later than three (3) business days prior to the rescheduled initial case management conference, the parties must file the joint proposed initial case management order and must email a copy in Word format to Ms. Jeanne Cox at Jeanne_W_Cox@tnmd.uscourts.gov. Unless otherwise excused upon appropriate motion, lead counsel for each party must appear for the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/17/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION DEFERRING DERIVATIVE ACTION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/15/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
April 15, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Milton S. McGee, III, and Steven Allen Riley. (mg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Deferring Derivative Action and [Proposed] Order (Joint) by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., E. Perot Bissell, David Duckworth, Ronald M. Fincher, Christopher R. Gordon, Vicky B. Gregg, William F. Grieco, Joey A. Jacobs, Wade D. Miquelon, William M. Petrie, Hartley R. Rogers, William Brent Turner, Reeve B. Waud. (Riley, Steven)
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.. (Riley, Steven)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Allen Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Steven)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Milton S. McGee, III on behalf of All Defendants (McGee, Milton)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Davydov. All Defendants. (Rifkin, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motions to appear pro hac vice (Doc. Nos. #7 , #8 , and #9 ) of Ashley R. Rifkin, Brian J. Robbins, and Stephen J. Oddo are GRANTED. Signed by VICKI R. KINKADE, ACTING CLERK OF COURT on 3/11/2019. (mg)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Stephen J. Oddo to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2867418) by Robert Davydov. (Oddo, Stephen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Brian J. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2867414) by Robert Davydov. (Robbins, Brian)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Ashley R. Rifkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2867406) by Robert Davydov. (Rifkin, Ashley)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/22/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., E. Perot Bissell, David Duckworth, Ronald M. Fincher, Christopher R. Gordon, Vicky B. Gregg, William F. Grieco, Joey A. Jacobs, Wade D. Miquelon, William M. Petrie, Hartley R. Rogers, William Brent Turner, Reeve B. Waud. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
February 22, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brian J. Robbins, Stephen J. Oddo, Ashley R. Rifkin: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 3/15/2019. (mg)
February 22, 2019 CA State Bar status verified as active for Brian J. Robbins, Stephen J. Oddo, and Ashley R. Rifkin. (mg)
February 22, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Wade B. Cowan. (mg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., E. Perot Bissell, David Duckworth, Ronald M. Fincher, Christopher R. Gordon, Vicky B. Gregg, William F. Grieco, Joey A. Jacobs, Wade D. Miquelon, William M. Petrie, Hartley R. Rogers, William Brent Turner, Reeve B. Waud (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2858214), filed by Robert Davydov. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davydov v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Duckworth
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky B. Gregg
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Grieco
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Brent Turner
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reeve B. Waud
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey A. Jacobs
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Perot Bissell
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartley R. Rogers
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Petrie
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade D. Miquelon
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R. Gordon
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald M. Fincher
Represented By: Steven Allen Riley
Represented By: Milton S. McGee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davydov
Represented By: Wade B. Cowan
Represented By: Ashley R. Rifkin
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?