Southern Electrical Retirement Fund v. Rossman, Inc.

Plaintiff: Southern Electrical Retirement Fund
Defendant: Dale C. Rossman, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00173
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESET for June 11, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint proposed initial case management order by June 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/22/2019. (am)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Southern Electrical Retirement Fund. (Jennings, R.)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
February 25, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Jan Jennings. (am)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Dale C. Rossman, Inc. (Attorney to pick up summons at the front counter.) (am)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dale C. Rossman, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2860194), filed by Southern Electrical Retirement Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Electrical Retirement Fund v. Rossman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale C. Rossman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Electrical Retirement Fund
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?