Cook v. Navient Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas Edward Cook, Jr.
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Interested Party: Teresa Azan and Lauren Langston
Case Number: 3:2019cv00188
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court acknowledges that all claims in this action have been DISMISSED without prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Navient Solutions, Inc.. (Russell, Edward)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Navient Solutions, Inc. (Russell, Edward)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court's Order referring this matter to the Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. 3) was entered prematurely and is, therefore, VACATED. This action will be referred, pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(c)(4), if the Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw the Reference (Doc. No. 1). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/11/2019. (jw)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***VACATED PER DE #4 ORDER*** ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/5/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) Modified on 3/12/2019 (jw).
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (af)
March 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory R. Atwood, Christopher S. McVay, & Edward D. Russell. (af)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference filed by Thomas Edward Cook, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USBC Docket Sheet 3:18-ap-90220)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Navient Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Teresa Azan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lauren Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Edward Cook, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory R. Atwood
Represented By: Christopher S. McVay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Edward D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?