American Addiction Centers, Inc. et al v. National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers
Plaintiff: American Addiction Centers, Inc., Addiction Labs of America, LLC and Recovery Brands, LLC
Defendant: National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers
Case Number: 3:2019cv00376
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: Jury Trial is reset for 5/10/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Pretrial Conference is reset for 5/2/2022 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/25/2022. Exhibit List due by 4/25/2022. Witness List due by 4/25/2022. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/29/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #6: Discovery due by 8/20/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 4/8/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Modify the Scheduling Order by American Addiction Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed CMO #6)(Van Horn, Daniel)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Report of Parties Regarding Mediation Efforts by American Addiction Centers, Inc.(Van Horn, Daniel)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers.(Faughnan, Brian)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Doc. No. #31 ). Plaintiff has responded to the Motion (Doc. No. #39 ), and Defendant has filed a reply (Doc. No. #43 ). For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 01/25/2021. (ln)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 01/25/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OPINION: Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Petition to Dismiss this Legal Action Pursuant to Tenn. Code Ann. 20-17-104 (Doc. No. #33 , Motion), accompanied by a supporting Memorandum of Law (Doc. No. #34 ). Accordingly, the Motion is DENIED. Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees (Doc. No. #38 at 7) is also DENIED, as the Court does not find the Motion to be frivolous. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 01/15/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #5. ORDER granting #73 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order. The parties shall complete all written discovery and depose all fact witnesses on or before April 23, 2021. Dispositive motions shall be filed by no later than May 3, 2021. Per the Court's August 12, 2020 Order (DE #65 ), the jury trial of this action remains set for August 3, 2021 beginning at 9:00 a.m. All other aspects of the Case Management Order and the Court's August 12, 2020 Order not modified by this Order remain in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/11/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Order re #67 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #55 Order on Motion to Continue, by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Order #5)(Creson, Gibeault)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: Having evaluated the Parties' arguments, the Court finds that NAATP has not met its burden on either point. For that reason, and because the automatic stay does not apply to lawsuits initiated by the debtor, NAATP's Motion (Docket No. #57 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/09/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE by American Addiction Centers, Inc. re #70 Order,, Status Report on the Bankruptcy Case (Van Horn, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: This matter is now before the Court upon Defendant's Motion for Stay of Litigation. Docket No. #57 . In arguing that such a stay will not impose any real undue delay in this case that will harm Plaintiffs, Defendants refer to a roughly four-month timeframe for the Chapter 11 bankruptcy proceedings. The Court therefore orders Plaintiffs to file, no later than November 6, 2020, a brief update on the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/03/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #4. ORDER granting #68 Motion modify Case Management Order: The parties shall complete all written discovery and depose all fact witnesses on or before December 11, 2020. Dispositive motions shall be filed by no later than April 2, 2021. Per the Court's August 12, 2020 Order (DE #65 ), the jury trial of this action remains set for August 3, 2021 beginning at 9:00 a.m. All other aspects of the Case Management Order and the Court's August 12, 2020 Order not modified by this Order remain in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/3/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Order re #67 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #55 Order on Motion to Continue, by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Order #4)(Creson, Gibeault)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion to extend the August 21, 2020 deadline for discovery motions to September 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/20/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified on 8/20/2020 (mg).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Extend Deadline for Discovery Motions re #62 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Creson, Gibeault)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER RESETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial is reset for 8/3/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2021 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/19/2021; Exhibit List due by 7/19/2021; and Witness List due by 7/19/2021. All lawyers who will participate in the trial must attend the pretrial conference. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/12/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: The Court held a discovery conference with the Parties on August 5, 2020, to discuss a discovery dispute related to the designation of certain document production as "confidential" subject to the terms of the Agreed Protective Order. The Parties discussed the issue and it was resolved with directions to the Parties to amend the previous production and appropriate designation of document production going forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/7/2020. (mg)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: A telephone conference is set for August 5, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. The parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please contact chambers at 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/4/2020. (mg) Modified on 8/4/2020 (mg).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Motion jointly moving the Court to extend the July 31, 2020 deadline for discovery motions contained in the existing Case Management Order #3 (DE #55 ) to August 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/29/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY to Response to re #57 MOTION to Stay Litigation During Bankruptcy Proceedings (Certificate of Consultation included) filed by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Order #3 re #55 Order on Motion to Continue, by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Creson, Gibeault)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Stay Litigation During Bankruptcy Proceedings (Certificate of Consultation included) filed by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 10, 2020 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - List of Creditors filed with Bankruptcy Court)(Creson, Gibeault)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support of #57 MOTION to Stay Litigation During Bankruptcy Proceedings (Certificate of Consultation included) filed by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration filed in Chapter 11 proceedings)(Faughnan, Brian)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Stay Litigation During Bankruptcy Proceedings (Certificate of Consultation included) by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers Suggestion of Bankruptcy of Plaintiffs (Faughnan, Brian)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #3 granting #54 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order and Continue Trial Date. Discovery due by 9/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/29/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Continue and to Modify Case Management Order by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Order #3)(Creson, Gibeault)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REVISING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2020. All other aspects of the Case Management Order not modified by this Order remain in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/5/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Proposed order revising case management order) filed by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 3/2/2020. (Hearing lasted 00:12)(ms)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Agreed Protective Order by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Agreed Protective Order)(Creson, Gibeault)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: The Defendant's motion to stay (Docket No. 44) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/7/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Blackburn, Christen)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Stay Discovery and #45 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NAATP's Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B - Palm Partner's Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Palm Partner's Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #4 Exhibit D - Docket Sheet from Palm Partner's case)(Creson, Gibeault)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support of #44 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers . (Blackburn, Christen)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Stay Discovery by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gentry v. Tenn Bd. of Judicial Conduct)(Blackburn, Christen)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (as to First Amended Complaint) filed by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION for Leave to to File a Petition to Dismiss Pursuant to Tenn. Code Ann. 20-17-104 (certificate of consultation included) filed by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to exceed the five-page limit. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/10/2019. (mg)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit in Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (as to First Amended Complaint) filed by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Creson, Gibeault)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION for Leave to to File a Petition to Dismiss Pursuant to Tenn. Code Ann. 20-17-104 (certificate of consultation included) filed by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2019 Tennessee Laws Pub. Ch. 185, Section 2)(Creson, Gibeault)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/24/2019. (mg)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Creson, Gibeault)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: On August 30, 2019, Defendant filed a Motion to Dismiss with supporting document and a Motion for Leave to File a Petition to Dismiss This Legal Action. #31 - #32 and #33 - #34 According to the Case Management Order filed on August 7, 2019, the Response is due within 28 days of the filing of the Motion, and any Reply shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the Response. #29 Any filings made related the Motion to Dismiss shall be considered by the Honorable Eli J. Richardson, District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/3/19. (gb)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support of #33 MOTION for Leave to to File a Petition to Dismiss Pursuant to Tenn. Code Ann. 20-17-104 (certificate of consultation included) filed by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers . (Faughnan, Brian)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to to File a Petition to Dismiss Pursuant to Tenn. Code Ann. 20-17-104 (certificate of consultation included) by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support of #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (as to First Amended Complaint) filed by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A By Laws, #2 Exhibit B - Ethics Code clickthrough)(Faughnan, Brian)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (as to First Amended Complaint) by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 2/2/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/18/2021; Exhibit List due by 1/18/2021; and Witness List due by 1/18/2021. All lawyers who will participate in the trial must attend the pretrial conference. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/8/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2019. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2020. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/2/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/7/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/7/2019 (in chambers). Order to enter. (Tape #Not Recorded.) (Hearing lasted :25)(hv)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: In light of the Amended Complaint (Doc. No. #27 ), filed August 2, 2019, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #20 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/6/2019. (mg)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers, filed by Recovery Brands, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Addiction Labs of America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Slide 10)(Creson, Gibeault)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION of Agreed-Upon Electronic Discovery Procedures by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Creson, Gibeault)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Creson, Gibeault)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Pending before the Court is a Joint Motion for Extensions Related to Pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #23 ). The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by August 2, 2019. If Plaintiffs file an Amended Complaint, the pending Motion to Dismiss will be moot and will be withdrawn by Defendant without prejudice to re-filing. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/22/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Extensions Related to Pending Motion to Dismiss re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Creson, Gibeault)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: On July 12, 2019, Defendant filed a Motion to Dismiss with attached supporting documents. Docket Nos. #20 - #21 . Any filings made related to the Motion to Dismiss (for example: extensions of time, exceed the page limits, seal documents, or make manual filings) shall be considered by the Honorable Eli J. Richardson, District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/15/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - By Laws of NAATP, #2 Exhibit B - Ethics Code clickthrough)(Faughnan, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers answer due 7/12/2019. The Initial Case Mgt Conference is reset to August 7, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 6/24/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Annotation - Deficiency Notice, Amended Certificate of Service by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#17 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (mg)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Complaint and to Reset Case Management Conference by National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. (Faughnan, Brian)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Christen C. Blackburn. (mg)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Christen C. Blackburn on behalf of National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers (Blackburn, Christen)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Brian S. Faughnan, and Christen C. Blackburn. (mg)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Faughnan on behalf of National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers (Faughnan, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers answer due 6/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/24/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Stipulated by Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC. (Creson, Gibeault)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Recovery Brands, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Addiction Labs of America, LLC. National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers served on 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Declaration of Return by Private Process Server)(Creson, Gibeault)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/7/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons issued as to National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gibeault C. Creson on behalf of Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC (mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Warren Van Horn on behalf of Addiction Labs of America, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., Recovery Brands, LLC (mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Addiction Labs of America, LLC. (mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Recovery Brands, LLC. (mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Addiction Centers, Inc. (mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2906696), filed by Recovery Brands, LLC, American Addiction Centers, Inc., and Addiction Labs of America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Warren Van Horn, and Gibeault C. Creson. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Addiction Centers, Inc. et al v. National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Addiction Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Warren Van Horn
Represented By: Gibeault C. Creson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addiction Labs of America, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Warren Van Horn
Represented By: Gibeault C. Creson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Recovery Brands, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Warren Van Horn
Represented By: Gibeault C. Creson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Addiction Treatment Providers
Represented By: Brian S. Faughnan
Represented By: Christen C. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?