Afrakhteh et al v. Nationwide Transport Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Autobahn South, Inc. and Ardavan Afrakhteh
Defendant: Skyline Carriers, Inc., Leif Elliott Ove, R.O.M. Express, Inc. and Nationwide Transport Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00403
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Ardavan Afrakhteh, Autobahn South, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Order Plaintiffs and Nationwide Transport Services, LLC, #2 Exhibit B- Proposed Case Management Order R.O.M. Express, Inc., Skyline Carriers, Inc., and Ove)(Mader, Jay)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Ardavan Afrakhteh, Autobahn South, Inc. re #21 Notice (Other) Filing of Conformed Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conformed Certificate of Service for Doc. 21)(Mader, Jay)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#21 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. The exhibits shall be REFILED by filing a Notice of Filing and attaching the exhibits with the mandatory brief description. (EXAMPLE: Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Police Report dated 1/1/06, # 2 Exhibit 2 Unreported Case Smith v. Jones). (am)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#21 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (am)
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Ardavan Afrakhteh, Autobahn South, Inc. re #4 Notice of Case Management Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mader, Jay)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 Summons issued as to Skyline Carriers, Inc. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Ardavan Afrakhteh, Autobahn South, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mader, Jay)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Leif Elliott Ove filed by Leif Elliott Ove. (Feeney, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 Leif Ove and Skyline Carriers ANSWER to Complaint by Leif Elliott Ove.(Feeney, John)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Leif Elliott Ove by Ardavan Afrakhteh, Autobahn South, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Attachment Proposed Entry of Default)(Mader, Jay)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Ardavan Afrakhteh, Autobahn South, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice - Skyline)(Mader, Jay)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Ardavan Afrakhteh, Autobahn South, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice - Ove)(Mader, Jay)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by R.O.M. Express, Inc..(Feeney, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide Transport Services, LLC.(Barham, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Ardavan Afrakhteh, Autobahn South, Inc. of Pending Admission of Paul E. Wehmeier (Mader, Jay)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nationwide Transport Services, LLC answer due 6/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [7,8,9]: This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (am)
May 28, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel O. Barham. (am)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nationwide Transport Services, LLC. (Barham, Daniel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Nationwide Transport Services, LLC. (Barham, Daniel) Modified Text on 5/28/2019 (am).
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel O. Barham on behalf of Nationwide Transport Services, LLC (Barham, Daniel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ardavan Afrakhteh, Autobahn South, Inc.. (Mader, Jay)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/16/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 16, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Paul Wehmeier: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/6/2019. (am)
May 16, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jay W. Mader, Paul Wehmeier. (am)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by R.O.M. Express, Inc. from Williamson County Circuit Court, case number 2019-211. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2913396) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - State Court Complaint, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Afrakhteh et al v. Nationwide Transport Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leif Elliott Ove
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.O.M. Express, Inc.
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Transport Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel O. Barham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autobahn South, Inc.
Represented By: Jay W. Mader
Represented By: Paul Wehmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardavan Afrakhteh
Represented By: Jay W. Mader
Represented By: Paul Wehmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?