Thirkill v. United States of America

Petitioner: Emmanuel Thirkill
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00408
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Disregard DE #6 - entered in error. (jw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD - ENTERED in ERROR*** Letter to the Court from Emmanuel Thirkill. Blank IFP form mailed to plaintiff. (jw) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jw).
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by United States of America. (jw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2019: #1 Exhibit 1 - Court Documents) (jw).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Emmanuel Thirkill. (jw)
May 21, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (as)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (as)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT by Emmanuel Thirkill. (as)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Emmanuel Thirkill.(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thirkill v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emmanuel Thirkill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?