Morgan v. Lee Company et al

Plaintiff: Nathan Morgan
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America, Lee Company and Cigna Group Insurance
Case Number: 3:2019cv00419
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. No. 10). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/16/19. (af)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: On July 11, 2019, the parties filed a joint stipulation of dismissal. ( #10 ) The initial case management conference set for August 5, 2019 is CANCELLED. There is nothing further to be done in this matter by the undersigned. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to return the file to the District Judge for his consideration of the joint stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/11/19. (gb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bradley, Marcie)
June 28, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Marcie Bradley. (gb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcie Bradley on behalf of Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America (Bradley, Marcie)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 6/18/2019. (gb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/22/2019. (mg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT #34675054905 in the amount of $400 re #1 Complaint. (gb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Cigna Group Insurance, Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America. (gb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
May 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Dewey Russell Thomas. (gb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cigna Group Insurance, Lee Company, Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Nathan Morgan. (Filing fee paid $400) Service copies will be returned by mail. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Lee Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Morgan
Represented By: Dewey Russell Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Marcie Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Company
Represented By: Marcie Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?