Kemp v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Petitioner: Yvonne Michelle Kemp
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2019cv00431
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Social Security Administration et al. and mailed to plaintiff's counsel for service this date. (Attachments: #1 Attachment summons 2, #2 Attachment summons 3)(af)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/16/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/29/2019. (jm)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Yvonne Michelle Kemp. (jm) Modified date filed on 5/23/2019 (jm).
May 22, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William N. Benjamin, Jr. (jm) Modified date filed on 5/23/2019 (jm).
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) Modified date filed on 5/23/2019 (jm).
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Yvonne Michelle Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yvonne Michelle Kemp
Represented By: William N. Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?