ServisFirst Bank v. Curae Health, Inc. et al
Appellee: Curae Health, Inc. and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Curae Health, Inc.
Interested Party: Lauren Langston and Teresa Azan
Appellant: ServisFirst Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00432
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Principal Brief by ServisFirst Bank. (Montgomery, Stephen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule: Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8018(a)(1), the appellant shall serve and file a brief within 30 days from the date the appeal was received and entered on the docket of this court. Brief due on or before July 22, 2019. (af)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 APPELLEE'S DESIGNATIONS FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appellee's Designated Documents from the USBC record)(af)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATIONS FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Statement of Issues, #2 Attachment Appellant's Designated Documents from the USBC record)(af)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 SHORT RECORD ON APPEAL FROM THE MDTN BANKRUPTCY COURT, Case number 18-05665. APPEAL FEE PAID. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate, #2 Attachment Order being appealed, #3 Attachment USBC Docket Sheet 18-05665)(af) Modified on 5/28/2019 (af).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ServisFirst Bank v. Curae Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Curae Health, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Gordon
Represented By: Caryn E. Wang
Represented By: Michael A. Malone
Represented By: Michael E. Collins
Represented By: Robert W. Miller
Represented By: Andrew H. Sherman
Represented By: Boris I. Mankovetskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Curae Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Collins
Represented By: Robert W. Miller
Represented By: Andrew H. Sherman
Represented By: Boris I. Mankovetskiy
Represented By: David E. Gordon
Represented By: Caryn E. Wang
Represented By: Michael A. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lauren Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Teresa Azan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ServisFirst Bank
Represented By: Stephen M. Montgomery
Represented By: James R. Kelley
Represented By: David G. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?