Henderson v. Waffle House, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sharita Henderson
Defendant: Waffle House, Inc., Mid South Waffles, Inc. and WH Capital, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00443
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/10/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 29, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (am)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mid South Waffles, Inc., WH Capital, LLC, Waffle House, Inc.. (Brooks, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT #34675054940 in the amount of $400 posted by Sharita Henderson re #1 Notice of Removal. (mg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (af)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (af)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (af)
May 24, 2019 TN State Bar statuses verified as active for Philip N. Elbert, Jeffrey A. Zager, Benjamin C. Aaron, James S. Higgins, Caroline N. LaBrec, William R. Johnson, & Christopher R. Brooks. (af)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Johnson & Christopher R. Brooks on behalf of Mid South Waffles, Inc., WH Capital, LLC, & Waffle House, Inc. (af)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mid South Waffles, Inc., WH Capital, LLC, & Waffle House, Inc. from the Circuit Court of Davidson County, TN, case number 19C960. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34675054940) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C-Civil Cover Sheet)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Waffle House, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waffle House, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Johnson
Represented By: Christopher R. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid South Waffles, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Johnson
Represented By: Christopher R. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WH Capital, LLC
Represented By: William R. Johnson
Represented By: Christopher R. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharita Henderson
Represented By: Philip N. Elbert
Represented By: Benjamin C. Aaron
Represented By: James S. Higgins
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Zager
Represented By: Caroline N. LaBrec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?