Casey et al v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Plaintiff: Etta Sue Casey and Paul James Casey
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Case Number: 3:2019cv00475
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Kroger Limited Partnership I.(Spicer, Richard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
June 5, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin K. Dean, Richard E. Spicer and Lindsey M. Shepard. (dt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (dt)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kroger Limited Partnership I from Circuit Court for Robertson County, Tennessee, case number 74CC1-2019-CV-126. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-2926280) (dt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2019: #1 Attachment - State Court Documents, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet) (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey et al v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Richard E. Spicer
Represented By: Lindsey M. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etta Sue Casey
Represented By: Benjamin K. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul James Casey
Represented By: Benjamin K. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?