Govea v. State of Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Tony Armando Govea
Defendant: District Attorney's Office and State of Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2019cv00480
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #9 Order. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (jm)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff lacks sufficient financial resources from which to pay the full filing fee in advance. Therefore, his application (Doc. No. #2 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff nonetheless remains responsible for paying the full filing fee. Tony Armando Govea is hereby assessed the full $350 filing fee. The Court has reviewed the complaint pursuant to the PLRA and, for the reasons explained more fully in the Memorandum entered contemporaneously herewith, finds that the complaint fails to state Section 1983 claims upon which relief can be granted. Therefore, Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED. This is the final Order denying all relief in this case. The Clerk SHALL enter judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(b). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/15/2019. (xc:Pro se party and the administrator of inmate trust fund accounts at the Montgomery County Jail by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/15/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tony Armando Govea. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter re Inmate Trust Fund Account, #2 Attachment Mailing Envelope) (jm)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Tony Govea requesting forms. (xc: Blank Petition For Relief From A Conviction Or Sentence By A Person In State Custody, Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form, Prisoners Only) AO 240, docket sheet, and (2) blank pleading forms sent to pro se party by regular mail.) (jm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Dismissal of all Charges filed by Tony Armando Govea. (jm)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's complaint cannot be processed at this time because he has not provided a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). In order to proceed with this action, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit the missing document to the Court within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/13/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
June 6, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (as)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (as)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tony Armando Govea. (as)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against District Attorney's Office, State of Tennessee, filed by Tony Armando Govea. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Document Request)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Govea v. State of Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Armando Govea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?