Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC et al v. Anglin et al
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder LLC and Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC
Defendant: Clifford L. Moody and Brandon G. Anglin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00500
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC. (Longnecker, Joy)
August 8, 2019 The Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/13/19 at 9:30 AM will be held in Courtroom 776. (af)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. (Doc. No. #8 .) This case is set for an Initial Case Management Conference on August 13, 2019, before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey S. Frensley. (Doc. No. #6 .) At the conference, the parties shall discuss with the Magistrate Judge the extent of the limited discovery necessary to prepare for a hearing on the motion. With the Magistrate Judge's approval, the parties shall set an agreed-upon briefing schedule so that the motion is briefed after the limited discovery, if any, is completed, and give the Court a target preliminary injunction hearing date. The parties should also estimate the length of the hearing. The parties are further advised that the Court requires the parties to depose any witness that will testify at the hearing at least seven days prior to the hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/19/2019. (jm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction "Conformed" (Longnecker, Joy)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not date the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (jm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, BR IP Holder LLC. Clifford L. Moody served on 6/14/2019. (Longnecker, Joy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, BR IP Holder LLC. Brandon G. Anglin served on 6/15/2019. (Longnecker, Joy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Gary Zullig Affidavit with exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 Franchise Agreement, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Longnecker, Joy)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/14/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
June 14, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joy Boyd Longnecker and Charles C. McLaurin. (jm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Brandon G. Anglin and Clifford L. Moody. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (jm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BR IP Holder LLC and Baskin- Robbins Franchising, LLC. (jm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brandon G. Anglin and Clifford L. Moody (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2933020), filed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, BR IP Holder LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Motion for PI, #4 Exhibit 3 - Ex 1 to Motion for PI - Aff of Gary Zullig w/Exhibits, #5 Exhibit 4 - Ex 2 to Motion for PI Franchise Agreement) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC et al v. Anglin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford L. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon G. Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder LLC
Represented By: Joy Boyd Longnecker
Represented By: Charles C. McLaurin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Joy Boyd Longnecker
Represented By: Charles C. McLaurin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?