Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. et al v. J. Peterman Company LLC, The et al
Plaintiff: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. and V. Alexander & Co., Inc.
Defendant: J. Peterman Company LLC, The and John Peterman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00505
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 (DISREGARD - ENTERED IN INCORRECT CASE) 6CCA ORDER (dt) Modified on 8/2/2019 (dt).
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #14 Order. (dt)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court acknowledges that this action has been DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. This Order shall constitute final judgment for purposes of Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/23/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by V. Alexander & Co., Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. (Clemons, James)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Brendan Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 6/27/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OPINION: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #4 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/25/19. (dt) Modified on 6/25/2019 (dt). (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/25/2019) (dt).
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Brendan Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2935792) by V. Alexander & Co., Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Clemons, James)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to The J. Peterman Company LLC and John Peterman. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
June 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Michael Clemons and John R. Clemmon. DC State Bar status verified as active for Brendan Collins. (dt)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brendan Collins: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/8/2019. (dt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by V. Alexander & Co., Inc., Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Attachment Declaration of Harry Buscher, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Clemons, James)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.. (dt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by V. Alexander & Co., Inc.. (dt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The J. Peterman Company LLC and John Peterman (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2934164), filed by Worldbridge Logistics, Inc., V. Alexander & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bill of Lading Terms and Conditions, #2 Exhibit B - Customs Powers of Attorney, #3 Exhibit C - Terms and Conditions of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Email dated 5/15/19, #5 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #6 Exhibit B - (Unsigned) Customs Powers of Attorney) (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc. et al v. J. Peterman Company LLC, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Peterman Company LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worldbridge Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Clemons
Represented By: Brendan Collins
Represented By: John R. Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. Alexander & Co., Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Clemons
Represented By: Brendan Collins
Represented By: John R. Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?