Walker v. United States of America
Petitioner: Antonio Rapheal Walker
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00516
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Antonio Rapheal Walker inquiring as to what he should do with the documents received from the Clerk's office. (mg)
July 11, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Byron M. Jones. (mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Byron M. Jones on behalf of United States of America (Jones, Byron)
June 24, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (as)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (as)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) #1 filed by Antonio Rapheal Walker. (as)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Antonio Rapheal Walker.(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Rapheal Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Represented By: Byron M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?