John Does #1-3 v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: John Does #1-3
Defendant: William B. Lee, Tony C. Parker and David B. Rausch
Case Number: 3:2019cv00532
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: William L Campbell
2 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/22/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 19, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Certify Class under Rule 23(b)(2) filed by William B. Lee, Tony C. Parker, David B. Rausch. (Shew, Dianna)
August 19, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by William B. Lee, Tony C. Parker, David B. Rausch.(Shew, Dianna)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for time requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 08/08/2019. (kw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleading by William B. Lee, Tony C. Parker, David B. Rausch. (Shew, Dianna)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion Excuse from attending ICMC. (JBB)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/18/19. (dt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to be Excused from Case Management Conference by William B. Lee, Tony C. Parker, David B. Rausch. (Shew, Dianna)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by William B. Lee, Tony C. Parker, David B. Rausch. (Shew, Dianna) Modified on 7/18/2019 (dt).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: By separate order, the Court has granted the parties' agreed motion to extend the terms of the Temporary Restraining Order and consolidate the hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for an injunction with the trial on the merits. Accordingly, the preliminary injunction hearing set for July 11, 2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/10/2019. (am)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/10/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing by John Does #1-3 re #11 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, of Proposed Agreed Order Extending TRO (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order Extending TRO)(Adams, Walter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 11:00 PM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (am)
July 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Dianna Baker Shew, Stephanie A. Bergmeyer. (am)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Bergmeyer on behalf of All Defendants (Bergmeyer, Stephanie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Dianna Baker Shew on behalf of All Defendants (Shew, Dianna)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs' request for preliminary injunctive relief (Doc. No. #6 ). The Court will hold a hearing on the Motion on July 11, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. Absent extraordinary circumstances, the hearing will conclude on that day. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Based on Plaintiffs' filings and the entire record, and for the reasons set forth herein, the request for a temporary restraining order is GRANTED on the terms and conditions stated herein. This TRO is effective upon its issuance on June 28, 2019, at 12:00 p.m., and expires on July 12, 2019, at 12:00 p.m., absent further order of the Court. Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction will be considered at a hearing on July 11, 2019, at 3:00 p.m., as set by separate order. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Summons issued as to William B. Lee, Tony C. Parker, David B. Rausch. (Service packets to be picked up at the front counter.) (am)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by John Does #1-3 . (Adams, Walter)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by John Does #1-3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Doe #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2-Doe #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3-Doe #3 Declaration, #4 Attachment Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Adams, Walter)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION to Certify Class under Rule 23(b)(2) filed by John Does #1-3 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Adams Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2-Mothershead Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3-Raybin Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4-McNally Declaration)(Adams, Walter)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Certify Class under Rule 23(b)(2) by John Does #1-3. (Adams, Walter)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re #1 Complaint filed by John Does #1-3 . (Adams, Walter)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order re #1 Complaint by John Does #1-3. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Protective Order)(Adams, Walter)
June 27, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Walter Justin Adams, Kyle F. Mothershead, Benjamin K. Raybin, Patrick T. McNally. (am)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William B. Lee, Tony C. Parker, David B. Rausch (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2941693), filed by John Does #1-3. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - SB 425)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Does #1-3 v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Lee
Represented By: Dianna Baker Shew
Represented By: Stephanie A. Bergmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony C. Parker
Represented By: Dianna Baker Shew
Represented By: Stephanie A. Bergmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Rausch
Represented By: Dianna Baker Shew
Represented By: Stephanie A. Bergmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does #1-3
Represented By: Benjamin K. Raybin
Represented By: Patrick T. McNally
Represented By: Kyle F. Mothershead
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?