Tolbert v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Lena Faye Tolbert
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00537
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: In light of the conditional transfer order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict litigation entered July 11, 2019, Docket Entry No. #8 , the initial case management conference scheduled for August 26, 2019, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/23/2019. (mg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 141) from the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2741, transferring the case to the ND of California. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (af)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/5/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
June 28, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark A. Smith, Adam S. Buddenbohn, Thomas Roe Frazer, II, Patrick D. McMurtray, Thomas R. Frazer, III, and William M. Pettit. (mg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Monsanto Company. (Smith, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Monsanto Company.(Smith, Mark)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lena Faye Tolbert (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2942023), filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - State Court Action, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolbert v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Faye Tolbert
Represented By: Thomas Roe Frazer, II
Represented By: William M. Pettit
Represented By: Thomas R. Frazer, III
Represented By: Patrick D. McMurtray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Mark A. Smith
Represented By: Adam S. Buddenbohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?