Gammon v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John E. Gammon
Counter Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00550
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties have filed a Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice (Doc. No. #10 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/25/2019. (jm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary with Prejudice by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Ferrell, E.)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/2/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) Modified on 7/3/2019 (af).
July 3, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Parks T. Chastain, E. Jason Ferrell, Cory Richard Miller, and C. Tracey Parks. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) Modified on 7/3/2019 (af).
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm) Modified on 7/3/2019 (af).
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory Richard Miller on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (jm) Modified on 7/3/2019 (af).
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Parks T. Chastain on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (jm) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (jm). Modified on 7/3/2019 (af).
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (jm) Modified on 7/3/2019 (af).
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against John E. Gammon by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Chastain, Parks)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from Circuit Court for Robertson County, Tennessee, case number 74CCI-2019-CV-86. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2943345) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gammon v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Gammon
Represented By: C. Tracey Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: E. Jason Ferrell
Represented By: Parks T. Chastain
Represented By: Cory Richard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?