Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC v. Jay-Ton Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC
Defendant: Jay-Ton Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00553
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jay-Ton Construction, Inc.. (Pannu, Jason)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jay-Ton Construction, Inc..(Pannu, Jason)
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference reset for 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/31/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Jay-Ton Construction, Inc.. (Pannu, Jason)
July 30, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jason M. Pannu, Michael S. Holder. (am)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Pannu on behalf of Jay-Ton Construction, Inc. (Pannu, Jason)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC. Jay-Ton Construction, Inc. served on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return Receipt)(Hicky, William)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC. (Hicky, William)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Summons issued as to Jay-Ton Construction, Inc. (Service packet sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for John David Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/8/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of John David Meyer filed by Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC re: Annotation - Deficiency Notice,,, #6 MOTION for attorney John David Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2945955). (Hicky, William)
July 5, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#6 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (am)
July 5, 2019 KY State Bar status verified as active for John David Meyer. (am) Modified Text on 7/8/2019 (am).
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney John David Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2945955) by Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hicky, William)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/2/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
July 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William B. Hicky. (am)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay-Ton Construction, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2943780), filed by Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC v. Jay-Ton Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay-Ton Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Holder
Represented By: Jason M. Pannu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterett Crane and Rigging, LLC
Represented By: William B. Hicky
Represented By: John David Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?