Alsup v. LKS Transport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Justin Alsup
Defendant: Daniel P. Foy and LKS Transport, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00555
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/4/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/28/19. (dt) Modified on 8/28/2019 (dt).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically #20 is GRANTED if local counsel for Plaintiff will attend the initial case management conference in person and be able to discuss the case in full and make any necessary scheduling decisions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/28/19. (dt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Continue Onitial Case Management Conference by LKS Transport, LLC. (Feeney, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically Jason R. Goren by Justin Alsup. (Goren, Jason)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Justin Alsup. (Goren, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LKS Transport, LLC.(Feeney, John)
July 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Goren on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goren, Jason)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Jason Ross Goren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/23/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Justin Alsup. LKS Transport, LLC served on 7/11/2019. (Bell, Mark)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Justin Alsup. Daniel P. Foy served on 7/12/2019. (Bell, Mark)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 12 & 13 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file these documents. (dt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 (DISREGARD - WRONG EVENT USED - ATTORNEY TO REFILE) GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #4 Summons Issued on LKS Transport, LLC Acknowledgement filed by Justin Alsup. (Bell, Mark) Modified on 7/22/2019 (dt).
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 (DISREGARD - WRONG EVENT USED - ATTORNEY TO REFILE) GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #4 Summons Issued On Daniel P. Foy Acknowledgement filed by Justin Alsup. (Bell, Mark) Modified on 7/22/2019 (dt).
July 17, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt)
July 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for John Thomas Feeney, III. (dt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Feeney, III on behalf of All Defendants (Feeney, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIPT #34675055543 in the amount of $100 re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Jason Goren from the United States District Court for the United States of Maryland filed by Justin Alsup. (Bell, Mark)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (dt)
July 10, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert David Boon, II. (dt)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David Boon, II on behalf of Justin Alsup (Boon, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Jason Ross Goren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Justin Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Bell, Mark)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/5/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/2/2019) (dt). Modified on 7/2/2019 (dt).
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Daniel P. Foy and LKS Transport, LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jason Goren: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/23/2019. (dt)
July 2, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark M. Bell and Robert David Boon, II. MD State Bar status verified as active for Jason Goren. (dt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel P. Foy, LKS Transport, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2943820), filed by Justin Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsup v. LKS Transport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Alsup
Represented By: Jason Goren
Represented By: Mark M. Bell
Represented By: Robert David Boon, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P. Foy
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LKS Transport, LLC
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?