Melton, Jr. v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jimmy R. Melton, Jr.
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00560
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 COPY OF ORDER entered in 3:19-mc-24 re suspension of attorney Robert J. Foy, signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr. on 8/19/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
August 22, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Whitney Henderson Raque and Robert Timothy Hogan. (jm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Henderson Raque on behalf of Jimmy R. Melton, Jr. (Raque, Whitney)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Because the deadline for responding to the pending motion to dismiss (Docket No. #6 ) falls within the time allowed for Plaintiff to retain new counsel, the deadline is extended to September 27, 2019. The initial case management conference scheduled for September 16, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/14/2019. (xc: Sent to Jimmy R. Melton, Jr. at address provided in this order by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS: The Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #14 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before August 17, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/30/2019. (jm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by United Parcel Service, Inc. of Admission of M. Allyson Lumpkin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, M. Allyson Lumpkin's Certificate of Admission)(Long-Daniels, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Robert J. Foy. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order) (jm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Memorandum in Support,, #6 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Refiling Motion to Dismiss, or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Agreed Order on Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond)(Long-Daniels, David)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Angela F. Ramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/15/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for David W. Long-Daniels to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 7/15/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Angela F. Ramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2950975) by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Certificate of Good Standing)(Haynes, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney David W. Long-Daniels to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2950960) by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Certificate of Good Standing)(Haynes, William)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/9/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(h)(2), the District Judge is provided notice that on July 3, 2019, Defendant filed a motion to dismiss with supporting memorandum (Docket Nos. #6 , #7 ). Any response by Plaintiff shall be filed pursuant to Rule 12, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Local Rule 7.01(a)(3). An optional reply may be filed within seven (7) days of the filing of the response, and shall not exceed five (5) pages. The Clerk is directed to forward the motion to the Honorable Waverly D. Crenshaw, Chief District Judge for his consideration of Defendant's motion to dismiss. The initial case management conference remains scheduled for 11:00 a.m., September 16, 2019, whether or not a ruling has entered on this pending motion, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, and the parties are expected to jointly file a proposed initial case management order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/8/2019. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Refiling Motion to Dismiss, or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. Notice of Refiling Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss, or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Notice of Electronic Filing (3:19-mc-9999 Document 390), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B -- Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss, or In Alternative for More Definite Statement (Master Case Document 390))(Haynes, William)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David W. Long-Daniels: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/24/2019. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Refiling Motion to Dismiss, or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Notice of Electronic Filing (3:19-mc-9999 Document 389), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B -- Motion to Dismiss, or In Alternative for More Definite Statement (Master Case Document 389))(Haynes, William)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm)
July 3, 2019 (***DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR***) NOTICE TO COUNSEL M. Allyson Lumpkin: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 7/24/2019. (jm) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (jm).
July 3, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL M. Allyson Lumpkin and Angela F. Ramson: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/24/2019. (jm)
July 3, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert J. Foy, William Joseph Haynes, III, and M. Allyson Lumpkin; GA State Bar status verified as active for Angela F. Ramson and David W. Long-Daniels. (jm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. (jm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Parcel Service, Inc. from Circuit Court for Rutherford County, Tennessee, case number 75CC1-2019-CV-75889. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2945131) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Proof of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit B - Letter from R. Foy, Summons and Notice of Right To Sue, #4 Exhibit C - Complaint and Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit D - Civil Rule & Execution Docket Rutherford County Circuit Court) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melton, Jr. v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: William Joseph Haynes, III
Represented By: M. Allyson Lumpkin
Represented By: Angela F. Ramson
Represented By: David W. Long-Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy R. Melton, Jr.
Represented By: Robert J. Foy
Represented By: Robert Timothy Hogan
Represented By: Whitney Henderson Raque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?