Dennis v. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jonetta L. Dennis
Defendant: J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00579
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for September 11, 2019 at 2:45 p.m. is hereby RESET for the same day at 1:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/19. (gb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Jonetta L. Dennis. (Elrod, Casey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Changas, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Changas, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 02:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (gb)
July 10, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jeffery S. Roberts, Casey W. Elrod, and David A. Changas. (gb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. from Wilson County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CV-349. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-2949098) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Notices to Plaintiff's Counsel and Circuit Court Clerk, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonetta L. Dennis
Represented By: Jeffery S. Roberts
Represented By: Casey W. Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Changas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?