Fletcher v. Little et al
Plaintiff: David Fletcher
Defendant: Hugo Salido, Alex Little, Metro Police Department and Gary Shannon
Case Number: 3:2019cv00588
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Alex Little answer due 10/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/5/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Alex Little. (Little, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Prayer for Relief by David Fletcher. (jw)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Alex Little. Forwarded to USM for service. (jw)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is GRANTED. All claims against MNPD are DISMISSED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ISSUE PROCESS to the Defendant Alex Little at the address provided in the Complaint. The Clerk is further INSTRUCTED to send Plaintiff a service packet (a blank summons and USM 285 form) for Defendants Salido and Shannon. Upon the return of the completed service packets, PROCESS SHALL ISSUE. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/1/2019. (xc: Order and 2 blank service packets to pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/1/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Discrimination, Slander & Defamation filed by David Fletcher. (jw)
July 15, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jw)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by David Fletcher. (jw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Little, Hugo Salido, filed by David Fletcher.(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher v. Little et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo Salido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Little
Represented By: J. Alex Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?