Care Services Management, LLC et al v. Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marquis Health Systems LLC and Care Services Management, LLC
Defendant: Michael Juban, Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC and J. Cody Cowan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00597
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and Judge Traugher's chambers. No order to enter.*** (mg)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Care Services Management, LLC, Marquis Health Systems LLC (Jackson, Jay)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion to Dismiss ( #14 ) is GRANTED. The plaintiffs may have an extension until September 3, 2019 within which to respond to the pending Motion to Dismiss ( #7 ). It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for September 11, 2019 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/16/19. (gb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Notice (Other), #8 Memorandum in Support, #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Care Services Management, LLC, Marquis Health Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-email)(Jackson, Jay) Modified on 8/16/2019 (gb).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Tom S. Easterly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (hb).
August 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for W. Travis Parham, and LA State Bar status verified as active for Tom S. Easterly. (mg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Tom S. Easterly from the United States District Court for the Middle of Louisiana filed by J. Cody Cowan, Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC, Michael Juban. (Parham, W. Travis)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Tom S. Easterly to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2967521) by J. Cody Cowan, Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC, Michael Juban. (Parham, W. Travis)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by J. Cody Cowan, Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC, Michael Juban. (Parham, W. Travis)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing by J. Cody Cowan, Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC, Michael Juban re #8 Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Adam Group Inc. v. Tunnell, #2 Exhibit 2: Birmingham-Jefferson County Transit Auth. v. Boatright, #3 Exhibit 3: MCS Music Am. Inc. v. Napster Inc., #4 Exhibit 4: Reinsdorf v. Acad. Ltd.)(Parham, W. Travis)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by J. Cody Cowan, Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC, Michael Juban . (Parham, W. Travis)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by J. Cody Cowan, Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC, Michael Juban. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Petitions filed in C.A. No. 3:18-cv-00269, #2 Exhibit B: Memorandum in support of motion to dismiss 04.11.18 in C.A. No. 3:18-cv-00269, #3 Exhibit C: Ruling 11.16.18 in C.A. No. 3:18-cv-00269, #4 Exhibit D: Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses 12.28.18 in C.A. No. 3:18-cv-00269, #5 Exhibit E: Order 01.03.19 in C.A. No. 3:18-cv-00269, #6 Exhibit F: Docket Sheet, C.A. No. 3:18-cv-00269, U.S.D.C., M.D. Louisiana)(Parham, W. Travis)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Travis Parham on behalf of J. Cody Cowan, Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC, Michael Juban (Parham, W. Travis)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 3:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to J. Cody Cowan, Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC, Michael Juban. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
July 15, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jay B. Jackson, III. (mg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J. Cody Cowan, Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC, Michael Juban (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2951039), filed by Care Services Management, LLC, Marquis Health Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Services Agreement, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Care Services Management, LLC et al v. Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Health Systems LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Care Services Management, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Juban
Represented By: Tom S. Easterly
Represented By: W. Travis Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Mobile Dental, LLC
Represented By: Tom S. Easterly
Represented By: W. Travis Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cody Cowan
Represented By: Tom S. Easterly
Represented By: W. Travis Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?