Spencer v. Medic Transportation, LLC
Plaintiff: Felicia Spencer
Defendant: Medic Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00630
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Submitted by all Parties filed by Felicia Spencer. (Parsley, Nina)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Medic Transportation, LLC.(Summers, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Medic Transportation, LLC. (Summers, James)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
July 25, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for James B. Summers and Nina H. Parsley. (jm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Medic Transportation, LLC from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 19C1379. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2958653) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Medic Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Spencer
Represented By: Nina H. Parsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medic Transportation, LLC
Represented By: James B. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?