G.E. et al v. Williamson County Board of Education
Plaintiff: S.B. and G.E.
Defendant: Williamson County Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv00634
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by G.E., S.B. (Cheffins, Cheryl)
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Thompson on behalf of Williamson County Board of Education (Thompson, Lee)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Williamson County Board of Education . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Allison Nunley, #2 Attachment unreported case, #3 Attachment unreported case, #4 Attachment unreported case, #5 Attachment unreported case, #6 Attachment unreported case, #7 Attachment unreported case, #8 Attachment unreported case)(Carson, Lisa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Williamson County Board of Education. (Carson, Lisa)
September 2, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by S.B., G.E.. Williamson County Board of Education served on 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Service)(Cheffins, Cheryl)
August 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lisa M. Carson and Deanna Lynn Arivett. (dt)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #11 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 07/31/2019.(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Williamson County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TDE Due Process Request Form, #2 Attachment unpublished case, #3 Attachment unpublished case, #4 Attachment unpublished case, #5 Attachment unpublished case, #6 Attachment unpublished case, #7 Attachment unpublished case, #8 Attachment unpublished case)(Carson, Lisa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Deanna Lynn Arivett on behalf of Williamson County Board of Education (Arivett, Deanna)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Carson on behalf of Williamson County Board of Education (Carson, Lisa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 Sealed Document filed by G.E., S.B.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Documents for Zone Appeal, #2 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit - Dr. Freeman)(Cheffins, Cheryl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by G.E., S.B. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Board Zoning Policy)(Cheffins, Cheryl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by G.E., S.B.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Declaration of Michael Braun)(Cheffins, Cheryl)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against S.B., G.E., filed by S.B., G.E.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Verification)(Cheffins, Cheryl)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/26/19. (gb)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #5 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Sealed Document filed by G.E., S.B.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Zone Exemption Documentation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Dr. Freeman)(Cheffins, Cheryl)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by G.E., S.B. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Board Zoning Policy)(Cheffins, Cheryl)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by G.E., S.B.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Declaration of Michael Braun)(Cheffins, Cheryl)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Williamson County Board of Education. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
July 25, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael F. Braun and Cheryl L. Cheffins. (jw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Williamson County Board of Education (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2959169), filed by S.B. and G.E. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.E. et al v. Williamson County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.B.
Represented By: Cheryl L. Cheffins
Represented By: Michael F. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.E.
Represented By: Cheryl L. Cheffins
Represented By: Michael F. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson County Board of Education
Represented By: Deanna Lynn Arivett
Represented By: Lisa M. Carson
Represented By: Lee A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?