Byard v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Randall Byard
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00659
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean Atyia on behalf of United States of America (Atyia, Dean)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney Donald Q. Cochran on 08/08/2019 by Randall Byard. (Olson, Peter)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AG William Barr on 08.15.19 by Randall Byard. (Olson, Peter)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
August 5, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 10/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESET for October 17, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint proposed initial case management order at least three days before the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/5/19. (gb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Randall Byard. (Olson, Peter)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIPT #34675055803 in the amount of $400 re #1 Complaint. (gb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (gb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
August 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Peter M. Olson. (gb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400 paid, To be receipted), filed by Randall Byard. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byard v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Byard
Represented By: Peter M. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Dean Atyia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?