Unum Life Insurance Company of America v. Tate et al
Plaintiff: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Jacob Lynn Tate, Jeremy Shawn Tate, Amanda Joy Tate, Bonnie Anderson Tate, Arthur Leonard Tate, IV, Lester Paul Murph and William Raymond Tate
Case Number: 3:2019cv00682
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS returned executed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Amanda Joy Tate served on 9/24/2019. (Williams, James)
October 1, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/4/2019 at 03:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Waive Proposed Case Management Order Requirement. It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for October 7, 2019 is hereby RESET for November 4, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/1/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS returned executed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. William Raymond Tate served on 9/18/2019. (Williams, James)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS returned executed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Lester Paul Murph served on 9/24/2019. (Williams, James)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS returned executed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Jeremy Shawn Tate served on 9/4/2019. (Williams, James)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Jacob Lynn Tate served on 9/25/2019. (Williams, James)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Bonnie Anderson Tate served on 9/25/2019. (Williams, James)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Arthur Leonard Tate, IV served on 8/23/2019. (Williams, James)
October 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jenna W. Fullerton. (am)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna W. Fullerton on behalf of Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Fullerton, Jenna)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Waive Proposed Case Management Order Requirement or, in the Alternative, for Extension of Time to File by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Williams, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to Lester Paul Murph. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 **DISREGARD**AMENDED DOCUMENT by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Amendment to #4 Summons Issued Lester Paul Murph. (Williams, James) Modified on 9/5/2019 (am).
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Unum Life Insurance Company of America as to Lester Paul Murph. (Williams, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Amanda Joy Tate, Jeremy Shawn Tate. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 **DISREGARD** AMENDED DOCUMENT by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Amendment to #4 Summons Issued Jeremy Shaun Tate. (Williams, James) Modified on 9/3/2019 (am).
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 **DISREGARD** AMENDED DOCUMENT by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Amendment to #4 Summons Issued Amanda Joy Tate. (Williams, James) Modified on 9/3/2019 (am).
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Unum Life Insurance Company of America as to Jeremy Shawn Tate. (Williams, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Unum Life Insurance Company of America as to Amanda Joy Tate. (Williams, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 03:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
August 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for James T. Williams. (am)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Lester Paul Murph, Amanda Joy Tate, Arthur Leonard Tate, IV, Bonnie Anderson Tate, Jacob Lynn Tate, Jeremy Shawn Tate, William Raymond Tate (Service packets sent to Attorney by regular mail.) (am)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (am)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lester Paul Murph, Amanda Joy Tate, Arthur Leonard Tate, IV, Bonnie Anderson Tate, Jacob Lynn Tate, Jeremy Shawn Tate, William Raymond Tate (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0650-2967384). filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plan, #3 Exhibit 2 - Death Certificate)(am) Modified Text on 8/7/2019 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unum Life Insurance Company of America v. Tate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Lynn Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Shawn Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Joy Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Anderson Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Leonard Tate, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Paul Murph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Raymond Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: James T. Williams
Represented By: Jenna W. Fullerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?