Roach v. Montgomery County Government
Plaintiff: Lisa Roach
Defendant: Montgomery County Government
Case Number: 3:2019cv00698
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Montgomery County Government. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Promotion Memo)(Harvey, William)
August 27, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William Timothy Harvey and Rebecca J. Garman. (jw)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca J. Garman on behalf of Montgomery County Government (Garman, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William Timothy Harvey on behalf of Montgomery County Government (Harvey, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Lisa Roach. Montgomery County Government served on 8/19/2019. (Williams, Anne)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 1:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Montgomery County Government. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
August 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Anne Hunter Williams, Heather M. Collins, Paige M. Lyle. (jw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Montgomery County Government (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2969495), filed by Lisa Roach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roach v. Montgomery County Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Roach
Represented By: Paige M. Lyle
Represented By: Anne Hunter Williams
Represented By: Heather M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Government
Represented By: William Timothy Harvey
Represented By: Rebecca J. Garman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?