Usherson v. Oh Boy Records, Inc.
Plaintiff: Arthur Usherson
Defendant: Oh Boy Records, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00702
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Robert Meitus to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/3/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 2, 2019 IN State Bar status verified as active for Robert S. Meitus. (am)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Robert Meitus to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3003100) by Oh Boy Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement)(O'Rear, Howell)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Oh Boy Records, Inc. answer due 10/4/2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/5/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert S. Meitus: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/26/2019. (am)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Respond to Complaint by Oh Boy Records, Inc.. (O'Rear, Howell)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/4/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice and Local Counsel Notice of Appearance by Arthur Usherson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Declaration, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Liebowitz, Richard)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel has sent a letter to the court, requesting a 30-day extension to file my pro hac vice motion and to find a local counsel. (Docket No. 6). This court does not deal with letter communications from lawyers as if they were motions. Plaintiff's counsel has filed pleadings in this court and must file a proper motion requesting whatever extension he needs. It is hereby ORDERED that this letter will not be treated as a motion by the court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2019. (am)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Counsel for Plaintiff. (Liebowitz, Richard). Modified on 9/3/2019 to terminate motion and change event to "letter" per chambers' instructions. (ds)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 9/10/2019. (am)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/3/2019. (am)
August 13, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Richard P. Liebowitz. (am)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Oh Boy Records, Inc. (Service copies sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oh Boy Records, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2970554), filed by Arthur Usherson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Photograph, #3 Exhibit B - The Book Infringement)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Usherson v. Oh Boy Records, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Usherson
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oh Boy Records, Inc.
Represented By: Seth Martin McInteer
Represented By: Robert S. Meitus
Represented By: Howell G. O'Rear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?