Vanderbilt Stallworth Rehabilitation Hospital, L.P. v. EBPA, LLC
Plaintiff: Vanderbilt Stallworth Rehabilitation Hospital, L.P.
Defendant: EBPA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00707
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2019; Discovery due by 7/31/2020; and Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2020. A subsequent telephonic case management conference shall be held on June 22, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/8/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/7/2019. (Hearing lasted :21)(tm)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for co-counsel David L. Cooper to be excused from personal attendance at the Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/3/2019. (mg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Co-counsel to be excluded from CMC on 10.07.19 by EBPA, LLC. (Cooper, David)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Woody, Ryan)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Ryan L. Woody to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/4/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing by EBPA, LLC re #9 MOTION for attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice [as to Ryan L. Woody] (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Ryan L. Woody)(Cooper, David)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (mg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Ryan L. Woody to appear Pro Hac Vice and NOTICE of Filing by EBPA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [as to Ryan L. Woody], #2 Attachment Certificate of Service, #3 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Cooper, David) Modified on 8/22/2019 (mg).
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by EBPA, LLC.(Cooper, David)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/19/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ryan Woody: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/4/2019. (mg)
August 14, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for David L. Cooper, and David P. Canas, and WI State Bar status verified as active for Ryan Woody,(mg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Cooper on behalf of EBPA, LLC (mg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EBPA, LLC. (mg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EBPA, LLC from Davidson County Chancery Court, case number 19-843-IV. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2971980) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanderbilt Stallworth Rehabilitation Hospital, L.P. v. EBPA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBPA, LLC
Represented By: David L. Cooper
Represented By: Ryan Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanderbilt Stallworth Rehabilitation Hospital, L.P.
Represented By: David P. Canas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?