Knight et al v. Montgomery County, Tennessee
Plaintiff: Jason D. Knight, Joshua Wikholm and David Webb
Defendant: Montgomery County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2019cv00710
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Montgomery County, Tennessee. (Harvey, William)
October 8, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#19 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (jm)
October 5, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended) filed by Jason D. Knight, David Webb, Joshua Wikholm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Excerpt of Montgomery County Commission Meeting)(Clark, Wesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jason D. Knight, David Webb, Joshua Wikholm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Excerpt of Montgomery County Commission Meeting)(Clark, Wesley)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Based on the agreement of the Parties, all discovery in this case is stayed pending resolution of the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Case Management Conference scheduled for October 15, 2019 is canceled and will be reset if necessary, following a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until October 8, 2019 within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
September 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2019. Order to enter. (Tape #Not Recorded.) (Hearing lasted :25)(hv)
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Montgomery County, Tennessee . (Harvey, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Montgomery County, Tennessee. (Harvey, William)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jason D. Knight, David Webb, Joshua Wikholm. Amendment to #1 Complaint, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resolution 19-8-3)(Clark, Wesley)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: A telephone conference is set for September 11, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. with the undersigned. The parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please contact chambers at 615-736- 7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/27/2019. (jm)
August 27, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Telephone Conference held on 8/27/2019. Another telephone conference set for 9/11/19 at 9:30 am. Order to enter. (Tape #Not Recorded.) (Hearing lasted :20)(hv)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Jason D. Knight, David Webb, Joshua Wikholm (of Intent to Amend Pleadings) (Clark, Wesley)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Judge Richardson's Order, a telephone conference is set for August 27, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. with the undersigned to set a briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. #4 ). The parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please contact chambers at 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/21/2019. (jm)
August 21, 2019 Notice to Counsel re DE [9 & 10]: The document contains the incorrect case number. The case number is 3:19-cv-0710. Counsel shall use this case number for all future filings. This document does not need to be re-filed. (jm)
August 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William Timothy Harvey and Rebecca J. Garman. (jm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (jm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca J. Garman on behalf of Montgomery County, Tennessee (Garman, Rebecca)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William Timothy Harvey on behalf of Montgomery County, Tennessee (Harvey, William)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The motion filed as Doc. No. #4 is DENIED IN PART and DEFERRED IN PART. Plaintiffs' request for a temporary restraining order contained within Doc. No. #4 is denied for the reasons discussed above. This matter is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to set a briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction apparently encompassed within the motion filed at Doc. No. #4 . Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/16/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Montgomery County, Tennessee. (jm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Counsel - Wesley Clark Pursuant to Rule 65. (jm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jason D. Knight, David Webb, and Joshua Wikholm. (jm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jason D. Knight, David Webb, and Joshua Wikholm. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(jm)
August 15, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Wesley B. Clark and Frank Ross Brazil. (jm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Montgomery County, Tennessee (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by David Webb, Jason D. Knight, and Joshua Wikholm. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Resolution 19-8-3 (August 12, 2019)(jm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2019: #3 Attachment Filing Fee Receipt) (jm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight et al v. Montgomery County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Tennessee
Represented By: Rebecca J. Garman
Represented By: William Timothy Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason D. Knight
Represented By: Wesley B. Clark
Represented By: Frank Ross Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Wikholm
Represented By: Wesley B. Clark
Represented By: Frank Ross Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Webb
Represented By: Wesley B. Clark
Represented By: Frank Ross Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?