Vancour v. Kroger Company et al
Plaintiff: Chad Vancour
Defendant: Peyton's Southeastern, Inc. and Kroger Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00713
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/7/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference (Unopposed) by Chad Vancour. (Turner, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chad Vancour. Peyton's Southeastern, Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2019. (Turner, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chad Vancour. Kroger Company waiver sent on 10/3/2019. (Turner, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/21/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Kroger Company, Peyton's Southeastern, Inc. (Service packets sent to attorney Gordon Jackson by regular mail.) (am)
August 16, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon E. Jackson, J. Russ Bryant, Robert E. Turner, IV, Nathaniel A. Bishop, Nina H. Parsley. (am)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kroger Company, Peyton's Southeastern, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2973421), filed by Chad Vancour. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Vancour Consent to Join)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vancour v. Kroger Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton's Southeastern, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Vancour
Represented By: J. Russ Bryant
Represented By: Nina H. Parsley
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Bishop
Represented By: Robert E. Turner, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?