Wolfenbarker v. Carter Co. Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: Robert Wolfenbarker, Michael Wolf and Wolf murder
Defendant: f/n/u Smith, Captain f/n/u Trivet, Jake Myers, Jimmy Gray, Patty Duffield, Sheriff Dextor Lunceford, f/n/u Holesloff, F/n/u Hodges, Carter Co. Correctional Center and James Parrish
Case Number: 3:2019cv00720
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Case transferred from Tennessee Middle has been opened in U.S. District Court - Eastern District of Tennessee as case 2:19-cv-00162, filed 09/13/2019. (jm)
September 12, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #10 Order. (jm)
September 12, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee. (jm)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Mail sent to Robert Wolfenbarker Returned as Undeliverable due to name not matching TDOC# re #5 Order. (xc: Docket sheet, #5 Order, and Administrative order 93 resent to pro se party by regular mail with updated TDOC# found on the Tennessee Felony Offender website.) (jm)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Because it appears from the Plaintiff's submission that he lacks sufficient financial resources from which to pay the full filing fee in advance, the application (Doc. No. #6 ) is GRANTED. Robert Wolfenbarker is hereby ASSESSED a $350 filing fee. IT IS ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Plaintiff's pending motions (Doc. Nos. #7 , #8 ), which effectively seek discovery, are DENIED without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to seek such relief from the receiving court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/9/2019. (xc:Pro se party and the Warden of the Bledsoe County Correctional Complex by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) Modified on 9/10/2019 (jm).
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Mail sent to Robert Wolfenbarker Returned as Undeliverable re Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case due to name not matching TDOC#. (xc: Resent to pro se party by regular mail with updated TDOC# found on the Tennessee Felony Offender website.) (jm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Have Allotted Time Frames Copied and Available for Plaintiff's Defense filed by Robert Wolfenbarker. (jm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Medical Records filed by Robert Wolfenbarker. (jm) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/3/2019) (jm).
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Robert Wolfenbarker. (jm) Modified on 9/3/2019 (jm).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's pending application (Doc. No. #4 ) is DENIED for its apparent inaccuracy and failure to attach the required trust account statement, without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to submit a second, accurate and properly supported application. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a new blank application to proceed in forma pauperis (short form) and a copy of Administrative Order 93. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/21/2019. (xc:Pro se party sent this order, a new blank application to proceed in forma pauperis (short form), and a copy of Administrative Order 93 by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
August 19, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Robert Wolfenbarker. (jm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Wolfenbarker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Mailing Envelope - 1 of 2, #2 Attachment Mailing Envelope - 2 of 2) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfenbarker v. Carter Co. Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wolfenbarker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wolf murder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain f/n/u Trivet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Dextor Lunceford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Holesloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/n/u Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Co. Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?