Martin v. HCA Human Resources, LLC
Plaintiff: Andretta Martin
Counter Plaintiff: HCA Human Resources, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00723
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Andretta Martin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit - Notice of Right to Sue)(Parsley, Nina)
October 1, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/22/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (am)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for date and time requested. The case management conference is rescheduled to October 22, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/1/2019. (kw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO RESCHEDULE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (UNOPPOSED) by HCA Human Resources, LLC. (Boston, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant HCA Human Resources, LLC's Answer to Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against HCA Human Resources, LLC, CROSSCLAIM against HCA Human Resources, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against HCA Human Resources, LLC by HCA Human Resources, LLC. (Dugosh, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/21/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Earl Boston, Thomas C. Dugosh, Nina H. Parsley. (am)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (am) Modified Text on 8/20/2019 (am). (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/20/2019) (am).
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HCA Human Resources, LLC. (am)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HCA Human Resources, LLC from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 19C1636. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2974781) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notices to State and Opposing Counsel)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. HCA Human Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: HCA Human Resources, LLC
Represented By: Robert Earl Boston
Represented By: Thomas C. Dugosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andretta Martin
Represented By: Nina H. Parsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?