Smith v. Queener et al
Plaintiff: Constance Smith
Defendant: Henry Queener and State Farm Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00725
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 REDACTION to #12 Sealed Document Settlement and Release (Redacted) to be filed as Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by State Farm Insurance Company. (Strange, Kelley)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER taking under advisement #9 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff will respond to the motion by November 18, 2019. Response is limited to 25 pages. Any reply will be due in 14 days after the response and is limited to 5 pages. The amount of the settlement in the original case will not be disclosed. The court notes the defendant did not address the question of jurisdiction as directed in Docket Entry 8 . Jurisdiction must be established before the court can properly rule on the pending motion. (JBB) (xc: pro se plaintiff by e-mail.) Modified on 10/17/2019 (dt). Modified on 10/17/2019 (dt).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Defendant should file a redacted copy of the settlement and release. Grounds have been properly stated for sealing that part of the document. (JBB) (xc: pro se plaintiff by e-mail.) Modified on 10/17/2019 (dt).
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 Sealed Document Exhibit A to Defendant State Farm Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Strange, Kelley)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss by State Farm Insurance Company. (Strange, Kelley)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State Farm Insurance Company . (Strange, Kelley)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by State Farm Insurance Company. (Strange, Kelley)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to conduct Case Management Conference by telephone. Parties will call 877-873-8017 and enter the code 1958322# when requested at the scheduled time which is CT. (We change from daylight to standard on Nov. 3). If there is trouble with the call in number the parties having trouble should call 615-736-2119 for additional instructions after waiting 5 minutes. The defendant will prepare a draft scheduling order and send it to the plaintiff 7 days before the conference. Plaintiff should provide the court at least one day prior to the conference a SHORT theory of her case and any suggested change to the scheduling order. These drafts should be sent to brownchambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov. In view of the Sixth Circuit opinion in a related case in this district Smith v. Queener 3:16-cv-3314 docket entry 33 at page 4 where the court held "The district court properly held that, as a United States citizen residing in Bermuda, Smith could not establish diversity jurisdiction. For diversity jurisdiction to apply under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)(3), the suit must be between citizens of different states, and the amount in controversy must exceed $75,000. In order to be a citizen of a State within the meaning of the diversity statute, a natural person must both be a citizen of the United States and be domiciled within the State. Newman-Green, Inc. v. Alfonzo-Larrain, 490 U.S. 826, 828 (1989). [D]omicile is established by physical presence in a place in connection with a certain state of mind concerning ones intent to remain there. Miss. Band of Choctaw Indians v. Holyfield, 490 U.S. 30, 48 (1989)." The court questions if it has jurisdiction over this case and why I should not recommend this matter be sent back to state court. Since the Defendant removed this case they must address this issue. (JBB) (xc: pro se party by email.) Modified on 10/11/2019 (dt).
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Request Hearing by Teleconference by Constance Smith. (dt)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Without Prejudice by Constance Smith. (dt)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/17/19. (xc:Pro se party by email.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joe Brown to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/4/19. (xc: Pro se party by e-mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 9/4/2019 (dt).
August 20, 2019 Notice e-mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet and blank, pro se forms included). (dt) Modified on 8/20/2019 (dt).
August 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lauren Paxton Roberts, Ashley Goins Alderson, Matthew J. Evans and Kelley E. Strange. (dt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (dt)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Insurance Company from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 19C1643. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2975158) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Queener et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Queener
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Represented By: Ashley Goins Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Evans
Represented By: Kelley E. Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?