Stone v. Genovese
Defendant: Kevin Genovese
Petitioner: John Willie Stone
Case Number: 3:2019cv00727
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from John Willie Stone regarding his filing fee re #5 RECEIPT #34675056414 in the amount of $5.00 posted by John Willie Stone. (mg)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIPT #34675056414 in the amount of $5.00 posted by John Willie Stone re #4 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (mg)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: John Willie Stone, an inmate at the Turney Center Industrial Complex in Only, Tennessee, has filed a pro se petition for the writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. (Doc. No. #1 .) However, the petitioner has not paid the filing fee, nor has he filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). The fee for filing a habeas petition is five dollars. If the petitioner is unable to pay the five dollars, he must file an IFP application declaring that he is unable to pay the fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send the petitioner a blank IFP application form. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/4/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with a blank IFP application form.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 28, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard Davison Douglas. (mg)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Davison Douglas on behalf of Kevin Genovese (Douglas, Richard)
August 21, 2019 (Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Willie Stone. (afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Genovese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Willie Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Genovese
Represented By: Richard Davison Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?