Champion v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Regina Anne Champion
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2019cv00732
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 9/30/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
September 27, 2019 MO State Bar status verified as active for Jeremiah D. Hayes. (am)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Jeremiah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed Social Security Administration served on 8/30/2019. (am)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General on 9/3/2019. (am)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney's Office on 8/27/2019. (am)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packets sent to USMS to effect service.) (am)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Plaintiff's Application to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/22/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Grayson Smith Cannon. (am)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Regina Anne Champion. (am)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Regina Anne Champion. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Anne Champion
Represented By: Grayson Smith Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeremiah D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?