Eight Mile Style, LLC et al v. Spotify USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Eight Mile Style, LLC and Martin Affiliated, LLC
Defendant: Spotify USA Inc.
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00736
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Robert P. Vance, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Kathleen Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Cory Struble to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Thomas Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Carey Ramos to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/18/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: This case is set for an October 21, 2019 initial case management conference (Docket No. #5 ), but, by agreement, the defendant has been given an extension until October 28, 2019 within which to respond to the Complaint (Docket No. #12 ). It is therefore ORDERED that the initial case management conference is hereby RESET for November 4, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The defendant's Motion to Adjourn the Case Management Conference and for a Stay of Discovery (Docket No. #14 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/2019. (mg)
October 17, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for attorney Rory Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3013493) by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Signed Affidavit, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
October 17, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Allison Stillman: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted. (LR 83.01(b)). Due by 11/7/2019. (mg)
October 17, 2019 NY State Bar status verified as active for Carey Ramos, Thomas Rubin, Cory Struble, Kathleen Sullivan, and Robert P Vance, Jr. (mg)
October 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark H. Wildasin. (mg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 34 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Eight Mile Style, LLC, Martin Affiliated, LLC. (Busch, Richard)
October 16, 2019 Filing 33 PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY in Further Opposition to Motion to Adjourn The Case Management Conference and for Stay of Discovery filed by Eight Mile Style, LLC, Martin Affiliated, LLC re #32 Order on Motion for Leave. (mg)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to file a Sur-Reply In Further Opposition To Motion To Adjourn The Case Management Conference And For A Stay Of Discovery. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/16/2019. (mg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for attorney Allison Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012988) by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Signed Affidavit, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by United States of America re #8 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, ACKNOWLEDGMENT BY THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA OF PLAINTIFFS CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE (Wildasin, Mark)
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark H. Wildasin on behalf of United States of America (Wildasin, Mark)
October 16, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for attorney Robert P. Vance, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012666) by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment 1: Signed Affidavit, #2 Attachment Attachment 2: Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for attorney Kathleen Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012663) by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment 1: Signed Affidavit, #2 Attachment Attachment 2: Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for attorney Cory Struble to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012659) by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment 1: Signed Affidavit, #2 Attachment Attachment 2: Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney Thomas Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012655) by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment 1: Signed Affidavit, #2 Attachment Attachment 2: Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Carey Ramos to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3012645) by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment 1: Signed Affidavit, #2 Attachment Attachment 2: Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Aubrey)
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Eight Mile Style, LLC, Martin Affiliated, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiffs Sur-Reply In Further Opposition To Motion To Adjourn The Case Management Conference And For A Stay Of Discovery)(Busch, Richard)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Samuel F. Miller terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/15/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 14, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Adjourn the Case Management Conference and For a Stay of Discovery - Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Harwell, Aubrey)
October 14, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice to Spotify)(Miller, Samuel)
October 9, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Adjourn the Case Management Conference and For a Stay of Discovery filed by Eight Mile Style, LLC, Martin Affiliated, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Tailgate Beer, LLC, v. Boulevard Brewing Company Order, #2 Exhibit B- April 17, 2019 Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit C- April 16, 2019 Hearing Transcript)(Busch, Richard)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Eight Mile Style, LLC, Martin Affiliated, LLC Of Intention To Oppose Defendants Motion To Adjourn The Case Management Conference And For A Stay Of Discovery (Busch, Richard)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service filed by Spotify USA Inc. re #14 MOTION to Adjourn the Case Management Conference and For a Stay of Discovery filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Scott, Marie)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#14 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (mg)
September 26, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Aubrey B. Harwell, III, and Marie T. Scott. (mg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie T. Scott on behalf of Spotify USA Inc. (Scott, Marie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 MOTION to Adjourn the Case Management Conference and For a Stay of Discovery filed by Spotify USA Inc. . (Harwell, Aubrey)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Adjourn the Case Management Conference and For a Stay of Discovery by Spotify USA Inc.. (Harwell, Aubrey)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey B. Harwell, III on behalf of Spotify USA Inc. (Harwell, Aubrey)
September 6, 2019 Set Deadline: Spotify USA Inc. answer due 10/28/2019. (mg)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. Extension to 10/28/19. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/6/2019. (mg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Spotify USA Inc.. (Miller, Samuel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel F. Miller on behalf of Spotify USA Inc. (Miller, Samuel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Martin Affiliated, LLC, Eight Mile Style, LLC. Spotify USA Inc. served on 8/26/2019. (Busch, Richard)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing by Eight Mile Style, LLC, Martin Affiliated, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Letter to United States Attorney General William P. Barr)(Busch, Richard)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Martin Affiliated, LLC. (Busch, Richard)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Eight Mile Style, LLC. (Busch, Richard)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 2:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Spotify USA Inc. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg)
August 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard S. Busch, and James Franklin Blumstein. (mg)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Spotify USA Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2977042), filed by Martin Affiliated, LLC, Eight Mile Style, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Musical Compositions, #2 Attachment - Report on The Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eight Mile Style, LLC et al v. Spotify USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eight Mile Style, LLC
Represented By: James Franklin Blumstein
Represented By: Richard S. Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Affiliated, LLC
Represented By: James Franklin Blumstein
Represented By: Richard S. Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify USA Inc.
Represented By: Cory Struble
Represented By: Carey Ramos
Represented By: Robert P Vance, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel F. Miller
Represented By: Kathleen Sullivan
Represented By: Allison Stillman
Represented By: Thomas Rubin
Represented By: Marie T. Scott
Represented By: Aubrey B. Harwell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Mark H. Wildasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?