Meadows et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Meadows and Dana Meadows
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00761
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Epling, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dana Meadows, Jeffrey Meadows. (Mangrum, Jason)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #13 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The response is due on or before October 16, 2019. Any reply is due on or before October 23, 2019. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/3/2019. (jm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, #13 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #18 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,, by Dana Meadows, Jeffrey Meadows. (Mangrum, Jason)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court (Doc. No. #9 ). Because removal was properly exercised under 28 U.S.C. 1441 and the court has jurisdiction over the claims put forward in the Complaint based on diversity jurisdiction, this Court need not address whether removal was also proper based on federal question jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. No. #9 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/1/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: On August 30, 2019, Defendant filed a motion to dismiss. (Docket No. #6 .) On September 14, 2019, Plaintiffs filed an Amended Complaint (Docket No. #10 ). Once filed, the Amended Complaint became the legally operative complaint, Drake v. City of Detroit, 266 F. App'x 444, 448 (6th Cir. 2008), thus rendering moot Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Clerk is therefore directed to terminated Defendant's August 30 motion to dismiss at Docket No. #6 . Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(h)(2), the District Judge is provided notice that on September 20, 2019, Defendant filed a renewed motion to dismiss with supporting memorandum as to the Amended Complaint (Docket Nos. #13 , #14 .) The Clerk of Court shall forward this motion and any responsive filings for the District Judge's consideration. All previously imposed deadlines remain in effect absent further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/30/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 28, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dana Meadows, Jeffrey Meadows. (Mangrum, Jason)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/26/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: On July 29, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a complaint against Defendant in the Chancery Court for Robertson County, Tennessee. (Doc. No. 1-2). On August 28, 2019, before Plaintiffs effected service of the complaint, Defendant removed this action to this Court. (Doc. No. #1 ). Plaintiffs have filed a Motion to Remand to State Court (Doc. No. #9 ), to which Defendant has responded (Doc. No. #12 ). Plaintiffs shall file a reply to Defendant's response within seven days of the entry of this Order of no longer than five pages. No further briefing will be permitted on this motion. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/23/2019. (mg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. . (Paulson, Daniel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Paulson, Daniel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Paulson, Daniel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE certificate of service filed by Dana Meadows, Jeffrey Meadows re Annotation - Deficiency Notice, #10 Amended Complaint filed by Dana Meadows, Jeffrey Meadows. (Mangrum, Jason)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (jm)
September 14, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed by Dana Meadows, Jeffrey Meadows.(Mangrum, Jason)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dana Meadows, Jeffrey Meadows. (Mangrum, Jason)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On August 30, 2019, Defendant filed a motion to dismiss and memorandum in support (Docket Entry Nos. #6 , #7 ). Any response by Plaintiff shall be filed pursuant to Rule 12, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Local Rule 7.01(a)(3). An optional reply may be filed within seven (7) days of the filing of the response, and shall not exceed five (5) pages. The Clerk is directed to forward the motion to the Honorable Eli J. Richardson, District Judge for his consideration of Defendant's motion to dismiss. The initial case management conference remains scheduled for 3:30 p.m., November 12, 2019, whether or not a ruling has entered on this pending motion, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/11/2019. (jm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. . (Epling, Brian)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit Assignment of Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit Appointment of Substitute Trustee, #5 Exhibit Notice of Federal Tax Lien, #6 Exhibit Certificate of Release of Federal Tax Lien, #7 Exhibit Complaint in Case No. 3:18-cv-746, #8 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion in Case No. 3:18-cv-746, #9 Exhibit Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in Case No. CH-18-CV-294, #10 Exhibit Order of Voluntary Dismissal in Case No. CH-18-CV-294, #11 Exhibit Judgment in Case No. 3:18-cv-746)(Epling, Brian)
August 29, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brian R. Epling, Daniel J. Paulson, and Jason S. Mangrum. (jm)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. from Chancery Court of Robertson County, Tennessee, case number CH-19-CV-331. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2981996) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Proceedings)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Meadows
Represented By: Jason S. Mangrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Meadows
Represented By: Jason S. Mangrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Brian R. Epling
Represented By: Daniel J. Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?