Borman v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jo Smith Borman
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00765
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Steven Douglas Parman. (dt)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Parman, Steven)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Publix Super Markets, Inc..(Parman, Steven)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Olivia Park: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 9/25/2019. (dt)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 4, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robin J. Gordon, Olivia Park and Steven Douglas Parman. (dt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Publix Super Markets, Inc. from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 19C1705. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2983490) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - state court filings, #2 Exhibit - civil cover sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borman v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Douglas Parman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Smith Borman
Represented By: Robin J. Gordon
Represented By: Olivia Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?