Shields v. Sang et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Shields
Defendant: Yongming Sang, Tennessee State University and Tennessee Board of Regents
Case Number: 3:2019cv00771
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss by Tennessee Board of Regents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parties Proposed Agreed Order for Dismissal)(Dalton, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tennessee State University . (Dalton, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Tennessee State University. (Dalton, John)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to complaint as requested. The Case Management Conference is continued until Dec. 9, 2019 at 1:00 pm. In the future when parties file a motion they should indicate if they have conferred with the other parties and if the motion will be opposed. The Court notes that the other defendants have not filed a notice of appearance or any request for an extension of time to respond to the complaint although they were served well over 21 days ago. Plaintiff is free to file a motion for default against them. (JBB)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by Yongming Sang. (jm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Lauren Shields. Tennessee State University served on 9/11/2019., GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed Acknowledgement filed by Lauren Shields. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Returned Green Card from Certified Mail)(Parker, Mary)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Lauren Shields. Tennessee Board of Regents served on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Returned Green Card from Certified Mail)(Parker, Mary)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Lauren Shields. Yongming Sang served on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Returned Green Card from Certified Mail)(Parker, Mary)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/3/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (jm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Yongming Sang, Tennessee Board of Regents, and Tennessee State University. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
September 3, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Ann Parker and Stephen C. Crofford. (jm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yongming Sang, Tennessee Board of Regents, and Tennessee State University (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2984150), filed by Lauren Shields. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields v. Sang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yongming Sang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee State University
Represented By: John W. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Board of Regents
Represented By: John W. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Shields
Represented By: Mary Ann Parker
Represented By: Stephen C. Crofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?