Donahue et al v. Depuy Synthes, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janice W. Donahue and Larry W. Donahue
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Ireland Unlimited Company, DePuy International, Ltd., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. and Depuy Synthes, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00786
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by Larry W. Donahue. DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. served on 10/5/2019. (Gilreath, R.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed by Larry W. Donahue. DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. served on 10/4/2019. (Gilreath, R.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by Larry W. Donahue. Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. served on 9/30/2019. (Gilreath, R.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Larry W. Donahue. Depuy Synthes, Inc. served on 10/1/2019. (Gilreath, R.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Larry W. Donahue. Johnson & Johnson International served on 10/1/2019. (Gilreath, R.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Larry W. Donahue. Johnson & Johnson served on 10/1/2019. (Gilreath, R.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Janice W. Donahue. Medical Device Business Services, Inc. served on 9/30/2019. (Gilreath, R.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Larry W. Donahue. Depuy Synthes, Inc. served on 9/30/2019. (Gilreath, R.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 ***DISREGARD, COUNSEL TO RESUBMIT*** SUMMONS returned executed by Larry W. Donahue. (Gilreath, R.) Modified on 10/9/2019 (mg).
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD, COUNSEL TO RESUBMIT*** SUMMONS returned executed by Larry W. Donahue. (Gilreath, R.) Modified on 10/9/2019 (mg).
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Medical Device Business Services, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., and Medical Device Business Services, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/9/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
September 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Christopher Gilreath. (mg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DePuy International, Ltd., DePuy Ireland Unlimited Company, DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd., DePuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2987979), filed by Janice W. Donahue, Larry W. Donahue. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donahue et al v. Depuy Synthes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Ireland Unlimited Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice W. Donahue
Represented By: R. Christopher Gilreath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry W. Donahue
Represented By: R. Christopher Gilreath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?