Lansdon et al v. Waddell
Plaintiff: William Lansdon and Gayle Lansdon
Defendant: Carmon Waddell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00789
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: William L Campbell
2 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
3 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 All future filings in this case should be made in the lead case 3:19-cv-660. (gb)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant's unopposed Motion to Consolidate this matter with case 3:19-cv-00660 ( #6 ) for all issues in these actions including discovery and trial due to their common questions of fact and law from the same accident, involving the same vehicles and accident witnesses, is GRANTED. This case is transferred to Judge William L. Campbell, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/1/19. (gb)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER the ICMC set for Nov. 13, 2019 is cancelled to be reset by Judge Frensley. (JBB)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. After discussion with Magistrate Judge Frensley. The clerk is direct to transfer this case at this level from me to Judge Frensley. This will better coordinate the two cases. A decision to consolidate them for other purposes can then be made. (JBB)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Carmon Waddell. (Sprader, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/10/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt)
September 9, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Glenda Hawkins Pipkin, Paul L. Sprader and Danica Renee Grosko. (dt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 RECEIPT #34675056212 in the amount of $400.00 posted by Carmon Waddell re #1 Notice of Removal,. (dt)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carmon Waddell from Circuit Court for Rutherford County, Tennessee, case number 76185. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34675056212) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lansdon et al v. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lansdon
Represented By: Glenda Hawkins Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Lansdon
Represented By: Glenda Hawkins Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmon Waddell
Represented By: Danica Renee Grosko
Represented By: Paul L. Sprader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?